HALL v. ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERTA HALL
Defendant: ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC., CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION, ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC. and AQUA FINANCE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00289
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/2/2019. (DMW)
August 1, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Settlement, filed by Plaintiff ROBERTA HALL (Edelman, Daniel)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The above case is hereby assigned for a TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on September 10, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. (EST), before the Honorable Doris L. Pryor, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. (See Order for additional information and deadlines.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/30/2019. (DMW)
July 30, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Initial Extension of Time to 08/12/2019 to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC. (Masters, John) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit docket text (DMW).
July 30, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Masters on behalf of Defendant ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC.. (Masters, John)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - granting #27 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Steven R. Johnson for ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to PHV applicant via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/24/2019. (DMW)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - granting #25 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. The appearance of Mary Frances Charlton is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/23/2019. (DMW)
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 Submission of Proposed Order , re #25 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Mary Frances Charlton, filed by Plaintiff ROBERTA HALL. (Combs, Cathleen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney Steven R. Johnson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number IP065935), filed by Defendant ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Receipt, #4 Envelope)(DMW)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Mary Frances Charlton, filed by Plaintiff ROBERTA HALL. (Combs, Cathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC.. (Modesitt, Terry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry R. Modesitt on behalf of Defendant ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC.. (Modesitt, Terry)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION. (Newburger, Manuel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION. (Newburger, Manuel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Harry Newburger on behalf of Defendant CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION. (Newburger, Manuel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AQUA FINANCE, INC.. (Newburger, Manuel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AQUA FINANCE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent BLACKSTONE GROUP L.P. for AQUA FINANCE, INC... (Newburger, Manuel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Harry Newburger on behalf of Defendant AQUA FINANCE, INC.. (Newburger, Manuel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of Service, filed by ROBERTA HALL. ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC. served on 6/22/2019. (Charlton, Mary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of Service, filed by ROBERTA HALL. ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC. served on 6/22/2019. (Charlton, Mary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service, filed by ROBERTA HALL. CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION served on 6/18/2019. (Charlton, Mary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Aqua Finance Registered Agent on June 19, 2019, filed by ROBERTA HALL., RETURN of Service, filed by ROBERTA HALL. AQUA FINANCE, INC. served on 6/19/2019. (Charlton, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC., AQUA FINANCE, INC., CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION, ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC. (DMW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC., AQUA FINANCE, INC., CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION, ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC.. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Daniel A. Edelman hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (DMW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
June 17, 2019 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered summonses that are not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(C), which requires a summons to state the name and address of the attorney of plaintiff... Plaintiff has tendered summonses without the contact information for counsel. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit properly completed summonses for issuance. (DMW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to Absolute House Care, Inc., Aqua Finance, Inc., Connexus Credit Union, Elite Marketing Services, Inc. d/b/a Elite Plumbing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Charlton, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Frances Charlton on behalf of Plaintiff Roberta Hall. (Charlton, Mary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathleen Maria Combs on behalf of Plaintiff Roberta Hall. (Combs, Cathleen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Goodwin on behalf of Plaintiff Roberta Hall. (Goodwin, Tara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff Roberta Hall. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff Roberta Hall. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roberta Hall. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5483157) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTA HALL
Represented By: Cathleen Maria Combs
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Mary Frances Charlton
Represented By: Tara L. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELITE MARKETING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Steven R. Johnson
Represented By: John A. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNEXUS CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Manuel Harry Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABSOLUTE HOUSE CARE, INC.
Represented By: Terry R. Modesitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUA FINANCE, INC.
Represented By: Manuel Harry Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?