TAYLOR v. SMITH
Petitioner: STEPHEN TAYLOR
Respondent: BRIAN SMITH
Case Number: 2:2019cv00292
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DISCIPLINE CASE) - Stephen Taylor's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary conviction in disciplinary case number ISF 19-03-0163 on March 25, 2019. The petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted. The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted.(Show Cause Response due by 8/6/2019.) (See Order.) Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/25/2019. (DMW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIPT #IP065596 for filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (DJH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner STEPHEN TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope). (MAC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance, filed by Petitioner STEPHEN TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by STEPHEN TAYLOR. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Petition Instructions, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRIAN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEPHEN TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?