RUTHRAUFF v. DROZDOWSKI et al
Plaintiff: MARK RUTHRAUFF
Defendant: JULIAN DROZDOWSKI and FTI Holdings
Case Number: 2:2019cv00309
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by MARK RUTHRAUFF. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGlone, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Discovery due by 6/19/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (GD)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Court will enter Case Management Order by separate order. Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2019 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is hereby VACATED. Discovery shall commence immediately. Plaintiff shall file overdue response to the Notice of Removal, as required by Local Rule 81-1(b), on or before August 28, 2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time). Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (GD)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. A motion for the entry of an agreed protective order should be filed as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 14 days prior to the original due date for any discovery response with regard to which the responding party proposes to rely upon the protective order when responding. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (DMW)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 2:19-cv-00309-JPH-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DMW)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore for all further proceedings. This case is related to 2:19-cv-308. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/21/2019. (PKP)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consolidation, filed by Defendants JULIAN DROZDOWSKI, FTI HOLDINGS (English, Katherine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Pfleging, Lesley)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant JULIAN DROZDOWSKI. (Pfleging, Lesley)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant JULIAN DROZDOWSKI. (English, Katherine)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 11:30 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor.The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/19/2019.(RSF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by FTI HOLDINGS.(Pfleging, Lesley)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FTI HOLDINGS identifying Corporate Parent 8815623 Canada Inc. for FTI HOLDINGS.. (English, Katherine)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to July 26, 2019 , filed by Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (English, Katherine) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit docket text (DMW).
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DMW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant FTI Holdings. (Pfleging, Lesley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant FTI Holdings. (English, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant FTI Holdings. (English, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Putnam Circuit Court, case number 67C01-1905-CT-000291, filed by FTI Holdings. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5504534) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 State Court Record Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Appearance, Jury Demand, Motion for Enlargement of Time, and Order on Motion for Enlargement of Time, Summons, and Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(English, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUTHRAUFF v. DROZDOWSKI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIAN DROZDOWSKI
Represented By: Lesley A. Pfleging
Represented By: Katherine Lee English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTI Holdings
Represented By: Lesley A. Pfleging
Represented By: Katherine Lee English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK RUTHRAUFF
Represented By: Daniel John McGlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?