PROUT et al v. THOMPSON
Plaintiff: KIM PROUT and ANNE PROUT
Defendant: MARY L THOMPSON and MARY L. THOMPSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00313
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs ANNE PROUT, KIM PROUT . (Winingham, William)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint , filed by MARY L. THOMPSON.(Smith, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/19/2019.(RSF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL against MARY L. THOMPSON, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Winingham, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr on behalf of Defendant MARY L. THOMPSON. (Bucher, Jonathan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time filed by Defendant MARY L. THOMPSON (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Charles) Modified on 7/18/2019 - corrected event title (RSF).
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Schroeder Smith on behalf of Defendant MARY L. THOMPSON. (Smith, Charles)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. MARY L. THOMPSON served on 7/8/2019. (Winingham, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (DMW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MARY L. THOMPSON. (DMW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARY L THOMPSON. (Winingham, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARY L THOMPSON. (Winingham, William)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Winingham on behalf of Plaintiffs ANNE PROUT, KIM PROUT. (Winingham, William)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARY L THOMPSON, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5510544) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Winingham, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROUT et al v. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM PROUT
Represented By: William E. Winingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE PROUT
Represented By: William E. Winingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY L THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY L. THOMPSON
Represented By: Charles Schroeder Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?