DOSS v. UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC
Plaintiff: RACHAEL R. DOSS
Defendant: UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00346
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 MARGINAL ENTRY - The Court acknowledges the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, dkt. #12 . Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/6/2019. (DMW)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff RACHAEL R. DOSS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kondras, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC. (Drummy, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC. (LAB) (DMW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC.(Drummy, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drummy on behalf of Defendant UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC. (Drummy, William)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by RACHAEL R. DOSS. UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC served on 7/26/2019. (Kondras, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DMW)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC. (DMW)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC. (Kondras, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff RACHAEL R. DOSS. (Kondras, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC d/b/a UAP CLINIC, LLC,, filed by RACHAEL R. DOSS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5543943) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOSS v. UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION ASSOCIATED PHYSICIANS CLINIC, LLC
Represented By: William W. Drummy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHAEL R. DOSS
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?