PURKEY v. UNDERWOOD et al
Plaintiff: WESLEY I. PURKEY
Defendant: WILLIAM E. WILSON, UNITED STATES, J. T. WATSON, BUCKLEY, UNDERWOOD, CORTES, R.D. SHEPHERD and CHRISTOPHER MCCOY
Not Yet Classified: JOHN R. MALEY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00355
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of USM Service by WESLEY I. PURKEY. UNITED STATES - Office of the United States Attorney served on 9/18/2019. (TMC)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECRUITMENT OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 87 - John Maley is appointed to represent the plaintiff in the above action pursuant to Local Rule 87. This representation shall continue until final judgment is entered unless otherwise modified by written order. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/4/2019. (DMW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION - Plaintiff Wesley Purkey's motion for appointment of counsel, dkt. #6 , is granted insofar as the Court will attempt to recruit counsel to assist Mr. Purkey in this matter. Mr. Purkey's motion for clarification, dkt. #7 , is granted insofar as the Court clarifies that pro bono counsel may enter an appearance for a litigant at any time. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/4/2019. (DMW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Documents for service by USM - re #9 Summons Issued, #8 Entry, #1 Complaint. Electronic notice to USM-C.(DMW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BUCKLEY, CORTES, CHRISTOPHER MCCOY, R.D. SHEPHERD, UNDERWOOD, UNITED STATES, J. T. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form US Attorney General, #2 USM 285 Form Office of the US Attorney, #3 USM 285 Form Christopher McCoy, #4 USM 285 Form J.T. Watson, #5 USM 285 Form Underwood, #6 USM 285 Form Dr. Shepherd, #7 USM 285 Form Dr. William Wilson, #8 USM 285 Form Dr. Cortes, #9 USM 285 Form Dr. Buckley)(DMW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY SCREENING COMPLAINT AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF PROCESS - The action shall proceed with Eighth Amendment claims against the seven individual defendants under the theory recognized in Bivens v. Six Unknown Federal Narcotics Agents, 403 U.S. 388 (1971). The action shall also proceed with a claim against the United States pursuant to the Federal Tort Claims Act, 28 U.S.C. 2671 et seq. If Mr. Purkey believes the complaint asserted additional claims, he shall have through October 1, 2019, to notify the Court of those claims. Personal service is required in serving Defendants (1) J.T. Watson, (2) Underwood, (3) Christopher McCoy, (4) Dr. Wilson (5) Dr. Shepherd, (6) Dr. Buckley, and (7) Dr. Cortes. Robinson v. Turner, 15 F.3d 82 (7th Cir. 1994). The Marshal for this District or his designee shall serve the summons, together with copies of the complaint (dkt. #1 ) and this Entry, on the defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2), at the expense of the United States. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/4/2019. (DMW)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Seeking Clarification for Counsel to Enter Appearance, filed by Plaintiff WESLEY I. PURKEY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(DMW)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff WESLEY I. PURKEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DMW)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY REGARDING FILING FEE - The notice of deficiency, dkt. #3 , is vacated. The plaintiff has paid the filing fee in full. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/12/2019. (DMW)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. (JRT)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. VACATED AT #5 .***NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through September 5, 2019 in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy to plaintiff by US Mail) (MEH) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DMW).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUCKLEY, CORTES, CHRISTOPHER MCCOY, R.D. SHEPHERD, UNDERWOOD, UNITED STATES, J. T. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, filed by WESLEY I. PURKEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP066003). (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Envelope).(MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PURKEY v. UNDERWOOD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM E. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. T. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D. SHEPHERD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER MCCOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY I. PURKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN R. MALEY
Represented By: John R. Maley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?