FLEEK v. WHITEPAGES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Fleek
Defendant: Rob Algard and Whitepages, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00496
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant WHITEPAGES, INC.. (Lay, Stacia)
December 3, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Grant Not to Dismiss Plaintiff, filed by Plaintiff TOMMY FLEEK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LBT)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Trial, filed by Plaintiff TOMMY FLEEK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Pro Se Initial Pretrial Conference - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The parties are to call 877-336-1274 Access Code 4665453 Security Code 219496. Please bring a copy of this order with you to the conference. Failure to attend this pretrial conference may subject your case to dismissal (if a plaintiff) or default (if a defendant). (See Order.) Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/2/2019.(RSF)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Not to Dismiss Plaintiff, filed by Plaintiff TOMMY FLEEK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Trial, filed by Plaintiff TOMMY FLEEK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant WHITEPAGES, INC.. (Lay, Stacia)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant WHITEPAGES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Meixner)(Lay, Stacia)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Venkat Balasubrmani for WHITEPAGES, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copies mailed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/14/2019. (RSF)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stacia Lay for WHITEPAGES, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copies mailed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/14/2019. (RSF)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by WHITEPAGES, INC.. (Cross, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of 28-day Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant WHITEPAGES, INC. (Cross, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Whitepages, Inc. re #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacia N. Lay to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5683498), #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Venkat Balasubramani to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5683512), #2 Notice of Appearance (Cross, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Venkat Balasubramani to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5683512), filed by Defendant Whitepages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Venkat Balasubramani in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cross, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacia N. Lay to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5683498), filed by Defendant Whitepages, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Stacia N. Lay in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cross, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whitepages, Inc.. (Cross, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant Whitepages, Inc.. (Cross, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Cross on behalf of Defendant Whitepages, Inc.. (Cross, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Putnam Circuit Court 1, case number 67C01-1909-CT-000597, filed by Whitepages, Inc.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5683333) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, Appearance, Complaint, Summons)(Cross, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLEEK v. WHITEPAGES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Algard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitepages, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Cross
Represented By: Stacia Lay
Represented By: Venkat Balasubrmani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Fleek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?