SMITH v. WATSON
Petitioner: KEVIN ROSS SMITH
Respondent: T.J WATSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00547
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to April 13, 2020 in which to #4 Order to Show Cause , filed by Respondent T.J WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reitz, Brian)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Reitz on behalf of Respondent T.J WATSON. (Reitz, Brian)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIPT #IP067909 for Habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (REO)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The respondent shall have until January 13, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the habeas petition, and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days after service of the answer in which to reply. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Petitioner via US Mail Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/3/2019.(JRB) Modified on 12/4/2019 (JRB).
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner KEVIN ROSS SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Envelope). (AKH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KEVIN ROSS SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Docket of Case History, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Additional Table of Contents, #4 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T.J WATSON
Represented By: Brian L. Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEVIN ROSS SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?