WALTERS v. CRANK et al
Plaintiff: LANCE WALTERS
Defendant: CHERYL PETTY, ANASTASIA BARNHART, STEPHANIE CRANK, PABLO PEREZ, MIKE METCHEFF, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC, BRIAN SMITH, HOOKER, GALBRETH, RYAN SNARR and CHRIS WILLIAMS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00568
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY DENYING AS PRESENTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint, dkt. #10 , is DENIED as presented because it is not accompanied by a proposed amended complaint. If Mr. Walters wishes to amend his complaint, he may file a renewed motion for leave to file an amended complaint, but he must attach a proposed amended complaint that includes all defendants, claims, and factual allegations he wishes to pursue in the action. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/23/2020. (KAA)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff LANCE WALTERS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LANCE WALTERS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY DENYING MOTION TO WITHDRAW CONSENT TO E-FILING PROGRAM - Plaintiff's motion to withdraw his consent to participate in the Courts e-filing program for Indiana Department of Correction (IDOC) prisoners, dkt. #6 , is DENIED. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/3/2020. (KAA)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk upon (1) Wexford Health Sources, Inc., (2) Dr. Pablo Perez, (3) Ryan Snarr, and (4) Cheryl Petty (KAA)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF PROCESS - Mr. Walters motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived. The action shall proceed with claims against Defendants (1) Wexford Health Sources, Inc., (2) Dr. Pablo Perez, (3) Ryan Snarr, and (4) Cheryl Petty, as discussed in Part II(B)(1). All other claims are dismissed for the reasons set forth in Part II(B)(2). The clerk is directed to update the docket to reflect that these are the only defendants in the action. The discussion of claims in Part II(B) addresses all claims the Court identified in the complaint. if Mr. Walters believes he alleged additional claims that the Court did not discuss in Part II(B), he shall have through January 17, 2020, to notify the Court and identify those claims. The clerk is directed to issue process to the defendants according to Part III above. Distributed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/3/2020. (KAA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Consent to E-Filing Programs, filed by Plaintiff LANCE WALTERS. (TMC)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LANCE WALTERS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LANCE WALTERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IDOC Transaction History Report). (AKH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANASTASIA BARNHART, STEPHANIE CRANK, GALBRETH, HOOKER, MIKE METCHEFF, PABLO PEREZ, CHERYL PETTY, BRIAN SMITH, RYAN SNARR, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC, CHRIS WILLIAMS, filed by LANCE WALTERS. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PCF Law Library Memorandum).(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALTERS v. CRANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL PETTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANASTASIA BARNHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE CRANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABLO PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE METCHEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOOKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALBRETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN SNARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCE WALTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?