PEARSON v. DWENGER et al
Plaintiff: PEARSON DOUGLAS and DOUGLAS PEARSON
Defendant: DWENGER and PRIMEAU
Case Number: 2:2019cv00583
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from Pearson Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 Letter Regarding Conditions from Douglas Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #7 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Thirteen Dollars and Thirty-Six Cents ($13.36). The plaintiff shall have through February 13, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/16/2020. (KAA)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from Douglas Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 Letter Regarding Release Date from Pearson Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Tort Claim, filed by Plaintiff DOUGLAS PEARSON (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Tort Claim, filed by Plaintiff DOUGLAS PEARSON (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TMC)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 Submission, filed by Plaintiff DOUGLAS PEARSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTIONS SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED - The clerk is directed to update the docket to reflect that the plaintiff in the above- captioned action is Douglas Pearson. The Court finds that Mr. Pearsons five cases involve common questions of law and fact. The Court further finds that Mr. Pearsons claims would be resolved most efficiently in a single case. Therefore, Mr. Pearson shall have through January 31, 2020, to show cause why the Court should not consolidate his actions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 1/9/2020.(KAA)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Submission of Statement of Claim, filed by Plaintiff PEARSON DOUGLAS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff PEARSON DOUGLAS. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(LBT)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of Consent to Magistrate Judge not Signed, filed by Plaintiff PEARSON DOUGLAS. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(TMC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Submission of Tort Claims, filed by Plaintiff PEARSON DOUGLAS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through January 3, 2020 in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). Copies to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copt to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DWENGER, PRIMEAU, filed by PEARSON DOUGLAS. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEARSON v. DWENGER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEARSON DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS PEARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWENGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?