BOHNERT v. MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Plaintiff: KOBY A. BOHNERT
Defendant: MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00246
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 UNIFORM STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/9/2020.(JRB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Kristofer)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2021. Discovery due by 3/5/2021. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/7/2020. (GD)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/7/2020. Approved Case Management Plan with parties' agreed changes to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 11:30 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #131, United States Courthouse, 921 Ohio Street, Terre Haute, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. The parties shall either use the Court's Uniform Protective Order http://www.insd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders or explain in the motion why a different form of order is being proposed. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/7/2020.(KAA)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 7/7/2020 at 3:00 PM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties have filed a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") see Dkt. #13 ; however, the Court will reset the deadlines in Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP as follows: SEE ORDER for further instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/26/2020.(KAA)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff KOBY A. BOHNERT . (Kondras, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC..(Martin, Laurie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff KOBY A. BOHNERT, Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff KOBY A. BOHNERT. (Kondras, Robert)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff KOBY A. BOHNERT. (Kondras, Robert)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristofer Wilson on behalf of Defendant MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Wilson, Kristofer)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Martin, Laurie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie E. Martin on behalf of Defendant MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (Martin, Laurie)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by KOBY A. BOHNERT. MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC. served on 5/18/2020. (Kondras, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.. (KAA)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff KOBY A. BOHNERT. (Kondras, Robert)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC., filed by KOBY A. BOHNERT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5987049) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kondras, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOHNERT v. MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOBY A. BOHNERT
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Kristofer Wilson
Represented By: Laurie E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?