BROWN v. WATSON
Petitioner: BRIAN L. BROWN
Respondent: T.J. WATSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv00259
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The Respondent shall have to and including 9/8/2020 to file his response to the 2241 petition. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/6/2020 (Copy mailed to Petitioner). (LBT)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 8, 2020 to respond to the Petitioners Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Respondent T.J. WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reitz, Brian)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy to petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/27/2020. (KAA)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Reitz on behalf of Respondent T.J. WATSON. (Reitz, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The respondent shall have until July 10, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the habeas petition, and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days after service of the answer in which to reply. The petitioner shall have twenty-eight days, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/22/2020.(JRB)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support the Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241, filed by Petitioner BRIAN L. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner BRIAN L. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by BRIAN L. BROWN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KAA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRIAN L. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T.J. WATSON
Represented By: Brian L. Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?