ELLINGER v. STREETER et al
Plaintiff: BUDDY ELLINGER JR
Defendant: GREG EWING, JOHN MANEL, CORIZON, JUDY ANDERSON, SUSAN STREETER, JOHN PLASSE and VIGO COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00335
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS - Mr. Ellinger's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #13 , is denied as presented. The clerk is directed to send Mr. Ellinger a blank form seeking leave to proceed without prepaying the full filing fee with his copy of this Entry. He shall have through September 17, 2020, to complete this form and renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis by attaching a copy of the transactions associated with his institution trust account for the 6- month period preceding the filing of this action on June 29, 2020. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion form) (KAA)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Correct Name of Defendant, filed by Plaintiff BUDDY ELLINGER JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff BUDDY ELLINGER JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 Docket #6 resent to Plaintiff BUDDY ELLINGER JR 885803 at MIAMI - CF based on IDOC website. (TMC)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #6 Notice of Deficiency sent to BUDDY ELLINGER JR. 966118 Miami CF. Return to sender - Name & DOC Number don't match. (TMC)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 Docket #5 resent to Plaintiff BUDDY ELLINGER JR 885803 at MIAMI - CF based on IDOC website. (TMC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #5 Notice to Pro se Litigant sent to BUDDY ELLINGER JR. 966118 MIAMI - CF. Return to sender - Name and DOC number don't match. (TMC) Modified on 7/30/2020 to correct DOC number (TMC).
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by Buddy Ellinger. Copy/Copies provided via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Public Docket Sheet) (AAS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Updated plaintiff's DOC number from 966118 to 885803 per the DOC website. (MEH)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through August 18, 2020, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee. Copies to plaintiff by US Mail. (in forma pauperis). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Form Motion to Proceed IFP) (MEH) Modified on 7/21/2020 (MEH).
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DWH) Sent Copy of Notice and Docket Sheet to Plaintiff via US Mail. Modified on 7/17/2020 (DWH).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00559. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/1/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 7/17/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Judy Anderson, Corizon, Greg Ewing, John Manel, John Plasse, Susan Streeter, Vigo County, filed by Buddy Ellinger Jr. (NEW CASE, No IFP or filing fee)(jld) Modified on 7/1/2020 (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Ellinger) (nae). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLINGER v. STREETER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG EWING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MANEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN STREETER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN PLASSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIGO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUDDY ELLINGER JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?