LAWSON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: SUSAN D. LAWSON
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 2:2020cv00367
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant is granted an enlargement of time, until November 14, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 9/10/2020. (KAA)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/14/20 to File Electronic Certified Administrative Record (Unopposed), filed by Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Alesia, Brian)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Alesia on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Alesia, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/17/2020. (KAA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Maria de la Torre on behalf of Plaintiff SUSAN D. LAWSON. (de la Torre, Adriana)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff SUSAN D. LAWSON. (de la Torre, Adriana)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by SUSAN D. LAWSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(de la Torre, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAWSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Brian J. Alesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN D. LAWSON
Represented By: Adriana Maria de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?