STEVENS v. TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN STEVENS
Defendant: CHUCK STRANAHAN, TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA and SHANE SMITH
Case Number: 2:2020cv00378
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Roberts, Liberty)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 9/28/2020 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/14/2020.(KAA)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants SHANE SMITH, CHUCK STRANAHAN, TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA. (Roberts, Liberty)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Liberty L. Roberts on behalf of Defendants SHANE SMITH, CHUCK STRANAHAN, TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA. (Roberts, Liberty)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by JONATHAN STEVENS. SHANE SMITH served on 7/24/2020; CHUCK STRANAHAN served on 7/24/2020; TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA served on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Green Card)(Frey, Eric)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SHANE SMITH, CHUCK STRANAHAN, TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA. (KAA)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Frey on behalf of Plaintiff JONATHAN STEVENS. (Frey, Eric)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHANE SMITH, CHUCK STRANAHAN, TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA, filed by JONATHAN STEVENS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6091120) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Frey, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEVENS v. TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN STEVENS
Represented By: Eric A. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK STRANAHAN
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF WEST TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE SMITH
Represented By: Liberty L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?