VERONICA v. ELMORE et al
Plaintiff: SOLORIO VERONICA
Defendant: WILLIAM WILSON, PENNY ELMORE and TOMMY J. WATSON
Case Number: 2:2020cv00419
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIPT #IP070660 for civil filing fee in the amount of $400.00, paid by the plaintiff. (AKH)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by SOLORIO VERONICA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff shall have through September 18, 2020, in which to pay the full filing fee to the Clerk of this Court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/19/2020. (KAA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff SOLORIO VERONICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Inquiry, #2 Envelope). (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENNY ELMORE, TOMMY J. WATSON, WILLIAM WILSON, filed by SOLORIO VERONICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VERONICA v. ELMORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY ELMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMMY J. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLORIO VERONICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?