FREEMAN-MANERS v. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN et al
Plaintiff: KELLY FREEMAN-MANERS
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN and AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00437
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 11/18/2020 at 3:30 PM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/19/2020.(KAA)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(von Schleicher, Warren)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A) AS TO BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN ONLY - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/25/2020. (JRB)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Boston Scientific Corporation Long Term Disability Plan Only, filed by Defendants AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AETNA, INC., Corporate Parent CVS PHARMACY, INC., Corporate Parent CVS HEALTH CORPORATION for AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (von Schleicher, Warren)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN. (von Schleicher, Warren)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren von Schleicher on behalf of Defendant BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN. (von Schleicher, Warren)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren von Schleicher on behalf of Defendant AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (von Schleicher, Warren)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KELLY FREEMAN-MANERS. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/3/2020. (Marks, Ashley)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KELLY FREEMAN-MANERS. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN served on 9/3/2020. (Marks, Ashley)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN. (KAA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (KAA)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Davidson on behalf of Plaintiff KELLY FREEMAN-MANERS. (Davidson, Melissa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley D. Marks on behalf of Plaintiff KELLY FREEMAN-MANERS. (Marks, Ashley)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, filed by KELLY FREEMAN-MANERS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6154437) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Marks, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEMAN-MANERS v. BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY FREEMAN-MANERS
Represented By: Ashley D. Marks
Represented By: Melissa A. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?