MCBRIDE v. WARDEN et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH MCBRIDE
Defendant: PHILLIPS, ALLBER, WARDEN, BARNS and ROBERT E. CARTER, JR.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00491
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Entry Discussing Pending Motions - The plaintiff's motion for assistance with recruiting counsel, dkt. #11 , is denied as premature. The complaint has not been screened and no defendants have been served. The plaintiff's second motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #10 , is denied as moot. The Court has already granted the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis in its Order of September 28, 2020. See dkt. #5 . Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/10/2020. (KAA)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet re #9 Submission, #1 Complaint, filed by Kenneth McBride. Copy/Copies provided via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Dkt. 1, #3 Dkt. 9) (AAS)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 Letter to the Court from Kenneth McBride. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (AAS)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH MCBRIDE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH MCBRIDE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Summons, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH MCBRIDE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Discovery Motion as Premature - #6 Motion to Compel, which this Court construes as a motion for discovery, is denied as premature. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/8/2020 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). (LBT)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH MCBRIDE (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AAS)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel, filed by Plaintiff KENNETH MCBRIDE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(AAS)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Ten Dollars and Forty-Two Cents ($10.42). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through October 26, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/28/2020. (RSF)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, KENNETH MCBRIDE. (Attachments: #1 Transaction History, #2 Exhibit A Receipt -- Administrative Remedy, #3 Exhibit B Report of Disciplinary Hearing Video Evidence Review, #4 Exhibit C Offender Grievance Case Report, #5 Envelope)(DJH)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLBER, BARNS, ROBERT E. CARTER, JR, PHILLIPS, and WARDEN, filed by KENNETH MCBRIDE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit A Receipt -- Administrative Remedy, #3 Exhibit B Report of Disciplinary Hearing Video Evidence Review, #4 Exhibit C Offender Grievance Case Report, #5 Exhibit D letter to commissioner, Certificate of Service, #6 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCBRIDE v. WARDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH MCBRIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. CARTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?