MITCHELL v. WARDEN
Petitioner: WAYNE MITCHELL
Respondent: WARDEN
Case Number: 2:2020cv00562
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DWH)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00889. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/22/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by WAYNE MITCHELL located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by WAYNE MITCHELL to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (LBT)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Wayne Mitchell. (No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned copy with case number to Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MITCHELL v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WAYNE MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?