BARRETT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, T.J. WATSON and MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Case Number: 2:2020cv00596
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 RECEIPT #IP071978 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $37.17, paid by Kimberly Skaggs for Plaintiff. (REO)
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN of Service, filed by All Plaintiffs. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Receipt, #3 Receipt)(Skaggs, Kimberly)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of thirty-seven dollars and seventeen cents ($37.17). The plaintiff shall have through December 31, 2020, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/2/2020. (JRB)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Skaggs, Kimberly)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Directing Payment of Filing Fee, Screening Complaint, and Dismissing Deficient Claims - No later than December 1, 2020, Mr. Barrett shall pay the $400 filing fee for this action to the clerk of the district court or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. Because a suit against the Federal Bureau of Prisons and its Director in his official capacity is a suit against the same defendant, one of the named defendants is unnecessary to this action. The clerk is directed to terminate the Federal Bureau of Prisons as a defendant on the docket. Mr. Barrett's Eighth Amendment claim and Rehabilitation Act claim shall proceed as pled against defendants Carvajal and Watson in their official capacities. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 11/16/2020.(KAA)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 RECEIPT #IP071514 for pro hac vice fee in the amount of $100.00, paid by Kimberly Skaggs for #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (DJH) Modified on 11/16/2020 (DJH).
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Marcinko Skaggs on behalf of Plaintiff KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT. (Skaggs, Kimberly)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, T.J. WATSON. (RSF)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/12/2020. (RSF)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, T.J. WATSON. (Skaggs, Kimberly)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (RSF)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kimberly M. Skaggs to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100 forwarded for processing), filed by Plaintiff KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RSF)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against MICHAEL CARVAJAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, T.J. WATSON, filed by KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Grievances, #2 July 26 letter, #3 October 1 letter)(RSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARRETT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT
Represented By: Kimberly Marcinko Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?