ABOUHALIMA v. LOTTS et al
Plaintiff: MAHMUD ABOUHALIMA
Defendant: LOTTS, BUCKLE, CLINT SWIFT, SCHALLER, SULLIVAN, D. THOMAS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, ALEXANDER and J.R. BELL
Case Number: 2:2021cv00029
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 RECEIPT #IP073000 for partial filing fee in the amount of $50.00, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee because the initial partial filing fee has been paid. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/5/2021. (JRB)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 Documents for service by USM - re #10 Summons Issued, #9 Order, #1 Complaint. Electronic notice to USM-C.(KAA)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ALEXANDER, BUCKLE, LOTTS, SCHALLER, SULLIVAN, USAG, US Atty. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form 7 total)(KAA)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - If the plaintiff believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court, he shall have through March 26, 2021, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is directed to issue process to defendants Lieutenant Lotts, Officer Alexander, Officer Sullivan, Officer Buckle, and Officer Schaller. The Marshal for this District or his Deputy shall serve the summons. The clerk shall terminate Unit Manager Thomas, Case Manger Swift, Warden Bell, and the Federal Bureau of Prisons as defendants. See Order. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/3/2021.(KAA)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of MAHMUD ABOUHALIMA - The plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis was granted through the assessment of an initial partial filing fee. That sum has been paid. However, plaintiff is still obligated to pay the remainder of the three hundred and fifty dollars ($350.00) filing fee. As of the issuance of this Order, the balance of the filing fee still due in this case is $340.00. Copies to Plaintiff and Warden via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/2/2021.(KAA)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee, filed by Plaintiff MAHMUD ABOUHALIMA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 RECEIPT #IP072747 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $10.00, paid by Plaintiff. (REO)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Ten Dollars ($10.00). The plaintiff shall have through February 26, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/27/2021. (KAA)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MAHMUD ABOUHALIMA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Federal Bureau of Prisons TRUFACS Inmate Statement, #2 Envelope).(AKH)
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEXANDER, J.R. BELL, BUCKLE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, LOTTS, SCHALLER, SULLIVAN, CLINT SWIFT, D. THOMAS, filed by MAHMUD ABOUHALIMA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 - Exhibits, #2 Envelope).(AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABOUHALIMA v. LOTTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINT SWIFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHALLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHMUD ABOUHALIMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?