PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP v. LEHMAN et al
Plaintiff: PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP
Defendant: William L Lehman, Rebecca A Lehman, WILLIAM L. LEHMAN, REBECCA A. LEHMAN, 0.52 ACRES OF REAL ESTATE IN VERMILLION COUNTY INDIANA, UNKNOWN OWNERS and HILLSIDE WATER CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv00258
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to HILLSIDE WATER CORPORATION. (KAA)
July 15, 2021 Filing 13 Submission of Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint Dkt #12 , filed by Plaintiff PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Easement)(Vershay, Ryan) Modified on 7/16/2021 (KAA).
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against REBECCA A. LEHMAN, WILLIAM L. LEHMAN, HILLSIDE WATER CORPORATION, filed by PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Hillside Water Corporation)(Vershay, Ryan)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Amended Rule 71.1 Notice to Defendants of Condemnation Action, filed by Plaintiff PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP (Vershay, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Derek Raymond hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Raymond, Derek)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Ryan John Vershay hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Vershay, Ryan)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to REBECCA A. LEHMAN, WILLIAM L. LEHMAN. (KAA)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (KAA)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Raymond on behalf of Plaintiff PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP. (Raymond, Derek)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Rule 71.1 Notice to Defendants of Condemnation Action, filed by Plaintiff PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP (Vershay, Ryan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP. (Vershay, Ryan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan John Vershay on behalf of Plaintiff PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP. (Vershay, Ryan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6629133) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - CPCN, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Easement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Rebecca Lohman, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to William Lehman)(Vershay, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP v. LEHMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE COMPANY, LP
Represented By: Ryan John Vershay
Represented By: Derek Raymond
Represented By: Derek G. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca A Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM L. LEHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA A. LEHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.52 ACRES OF REAL ESTATE IN VERMILLION COUNTY INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OWNERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLSIDE WATER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?