GEHEB et al v. JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC
Plaintiff: MARK D. GEHEB and KATHRYN M. GEHEB
Defendant: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00407
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 Witness List Preliminary Witness and Exhibits List, filed by Defendant JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC. (Shaw, Brittany)
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 Preliminary Witness List and Exhibit List of Plaintiffs, filed by Plaintiffs KATHRYN M. GEHEB, MARK D. GEHEB. (TPS)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhea Jones-Price on behalf of Plaintiffs KATHRYN M. GEHEB, MARK D. GEHEB. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Appearance) (TPS)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by KATHRYN M. GEHEB, MARK D. GEHEB. (AAS)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal, by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Docket Sheet, Complaint, Summons, Notice of Appearance, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint., #2 Complaint)(Shaw, Brittany)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. The parties shall either use the Court's Uniform Protective Order or explain in the motion why a different form of order is being proposed. SEE ORDER. Copies to plaintiffs via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/9/2021.(KAA)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2022. Discovery due by 8/12/2022. SO ORDERED. Copies to plaintiffs via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/9/2021.(KAA) Modified on 11/9/2021 (GD).
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC.(Shaw, Brittany)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Brittany Lyn Shaw hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. Change of Address for Attorney Brittany L. Shaw all other contact information remains the same. (Shaw, Brittany)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I. Marcus on behalf of Defendant JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC. (Marcus, Morgan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(Shaw, Brittany)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) Modified on 11/1/2021 - copy mailed to plaintiffs (KAA).
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA) Modified on 11/1/2021 - copy mailed to plaintiffs (KAA).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Lyn Shaw on behalf of Defendant JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC. (Shaw, Brittany)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CL HOLDINGS, LLC for JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC.. (Shaw, Brittany)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox Superior Court, Knox County Indiana, case number 42C01-2109-CT-000023, filed by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6815284) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaw, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEHEB et al v. JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK D. GEHEB
Represented By: Rhea Jones-Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN M. GEHEB
Represented By: Rhea Jones-Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Brittany Lyn Shaw
Represented By: Morgan I. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?