BLAGRAVE v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: ROBERT BLAGRAVE
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 2:2022cv00037
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiff seeks judicial review of the defendant Commissioner's denial of Plaintiff's claim for Social Security benefits based on disability. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court now enters the following orders. Briefing Schedule: SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 3/29/2022.(KAA)
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative records part 1, #3 administrative records part 2, #4 payment documents, #5 jurisdictional documents part 1, #6 jurisdictional records part 2, #7 non disability related records, #8 disability related records part 1, #9 disability related records part 2, #10 medical records part 1, #11 medical records part 2, #12 medical records part 3, #13 medical records part 4, #14 medical records part 5, #15 medical records part 6, #16 medical records part 7, #17 medical records part 8, #18 medical records part 9, #19 medical records part 10, #20 medical records part 11, #21 medical records part 12, #22 medical records part 13, #23 medical records part 14, #24 medical records part 15, #25 medical records part 16)(Wierenga, Julian)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE - The cause number of this action shall be amended as shown above to reflect the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge. PLEASE USE THE ALTERED CASE NUMBER OF 2:22-cv-0037-MG-JRS ON ALL FUTURE FILINGS WITH THIS COURT. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/25/2022.(TPS)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Wierenga, Julian)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Wierenga, Julian)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (TPS)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William Martain Krowl on behalf of Plaintiff ROBERT BLAGRAVE. (Krowl, William)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by ROBERT BLAGRAVE. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6950199) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krowl, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAGRAVE v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BLAGRAVE
Represented By: William Martain Krowl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?