SCHELL v. KIJAKAZI
Plaintiff: NICOLE M. SCHELL
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Case Number: 2:2022cv00040
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative records part 1, #3 administrative records part 2, #4 administrative records part 3, #5 payment records part 1, #6 payment records part 2, #7 jurisdictional documents part 1, #8 jurisdictional documents part 2, #9 jurisdictional documents part 3, #10 jurisdictional documents part 4, #11 non disability related records, #12 disability related records part 1, #13 disability related records part 2, #14 medical records part 1, #15 medical records part 2, #16 medical records part 3, #17 medical records part 4, #18 medical records part 5, #19 medical records part 6, #20 medical records part 7, #21 medical records part 8)(Wierenga, Julian)
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant KILOLO KIJAKAZI. (Wierenga, Julian)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/2/2022. (TPS)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (TPS)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Maria de la Torre on behalf of Plaintiff NICOLE M. SCHELL. (de la Torre, Adriana)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff NICOLE M. SCHELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(de la Torre, Adriana)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KILOLO KIJAKAZI, filed by NICOLE M. SCHELL. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(de la Torre, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHELL v. KIJAKAZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE M. SCHELL
Represented By: Adriana Maria de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?