RIETEL v. HOLCOMB et al
Plaintiff: LARRY D. RIETEL, JR.
Defendant: ERIC HOLCOMB, DAVID BULTER, RANDAL TAYLOR and DAVID BUTLER
Case Number: 2:2022cv00130
Filed: April 3, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/9/2022.(KAA)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal and DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Final judgment shall enter accordingly. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/9/2022. (KAA)
June 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff LARRY D. RIETEL, JR. (KAA)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Court interprets Mr. Rietel's Motion as requesting a 21-day extension of the May 20, 2022 deadline in which to file an Amended Complaint, GRANTS the Motion, #6 , and ORDERS that Mr. Rietel shall have until June 10, 2022 to file an Amended Complaint that addresses the deficiencies outlined in the Court's April 14, 2022 Entry and otherwise complies with federal pleading standards. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/12/2022. (KAA)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Amend #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LARRY D. RIETEL, JR. (TPS)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Mr. Rietel's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 , is GRANTED. Mr. Rietel's Complaint, #1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Rietel shall have until May 20, 2022 to file an Amended Complaint that addresses the deficiencies outlined in this Entry and otherwise complies with federal pleading standards. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/14/2022. (KAA)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by LARRY D. RIETEL, JR. (KAA)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS)
April 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LARRY D. RIETEL, JR. (TPS)
April 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID BULTER, ERIC HOLCOMB, RANDAL TAYLOR, filed by LARRY D. RIETEL, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (TPS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIETEL v. HOLCOMB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY D. RIETEL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HOLCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BULTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDAL TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?