POWELL v. ZATECKY
Petitioner: TYRONE POWELL
Respondent: DASHAN ZATECKY
Case Number: 2:2022cv00536
Filed: November 23, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: M Kendra Klump
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Respondent is GRANTED an enlargement of time, up to and including March 14, 2023, within which to file and serve a motion to dismiss or a return. Copy to petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/10/2023. (KAA)
January 6, 2023 Filing 9 Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (2:22-cv-00536-JMS-MKK), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JD)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/14/2023 in which to #4 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary) , filed by Respondent DASHAN ZATECKY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-Hearing Report, #3 Exhibit B--OIS Report-Powell, #4 Exhibit C-DCAO)(Weiss, Natalie)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Faye Weiss on behalf of Respondent DASHAN ZATECKY. (Weiss, Natalie)
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (2:22-cv-00536-JMS-MJD), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (CJD)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 RECEIPT #2820 for habeas fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by TYRONE POWELL. (DRB)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 1/9/2023. Mr. Powell's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is denied. Mr. Powell shall have through December 28, 2022, to pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action. Further, the clerk is directed to seal Mr. Powell's motion, dkt. #2 . Copy sent to petitioner via US mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/28/2022.(TPS)
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner TYRONE POWELL. (KAA)
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TYRONE POWELL. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KAA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWELL v. ZATECKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TYRONE POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DASHAN ZATECKY
Represented By: Natalie Faye Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?