WALKER v. GILSTRAP et al
Plaintiff: RAFAEL L. WALKER
Defendant: DAVID GILSTRAP, FAUST, JACKIE BROWN, FRANK VANIHEL, CHRISTOPHER HOLCOMB, SHELBY CRICHFIELD and THOMAS WELLINGTON
Case Number: 2:2023cv00150
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Filing 12 Documents to be Sent via Electronic Notice - re #10 Order, #1 Complaint, #11 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk Electronic Notice to IDOC. (JSR)
May 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk upon: 1) Frank Vanihel; 2) Christopher Holcomb; 3) Shelby Crichfield; 4) Thomas Wellington; 5) David Gilstrap; 6) Chaplain Faust; and 7) Jackie Brown. (JSR)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - Plaintiff Rafael Walker is a prisoner currently incarcerated at Wabash Valley Correctional Facility ("WVCF"). He filed this civil action alleging that the defendants confiscated his rosary, denied him access to his religious medallion, and subjected him to unhygienic bedding and clothing. Because the plaintiff is a "prisoner," this Court has an obligation to screen the complaint before service on the defendants. This summary of claims includes all of the viable claims identified by the Court. All other claims have been dismissed. If the plaintiff believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court, he shall have through June 2, 2023, in which to identify those claims. The clerk shall add Frank Vanihel, Christopher Holcomb, Shelby Crichfield and Thomas Wellington as defendants on the docket. The clerk is directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to the defendants in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint, dkt #1 , applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Order. The clerk is directed to serve the Indiana Department of Correction employees electronically. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/10/2023. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (JSR)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as unnecessary because he has already been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/6/2023. (KAA)
April 4, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by RAFAEL L. WALKER. (DWH)
April 3, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RAFAEL L. WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JDC)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Although the plaintiff is excused from pre-paying the full filing fee, he still must pay the three hundred and fifty dollar ($350.00) filing fee pursuant to the statutory formula set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) when able. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) ("the prisoner shall be required to pay the full amount of a filing fee."). The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/31/2023. (SWM)
March 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail). (JRT)
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
March 27, 2023 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RAFAEL L. WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Certified Counselors Statement of Inmate Trust Fund Account, Resident Activity Reports)(DJH)
March 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JACKIE BROWN, FAUST, DAVID GILSTRAP, filed by RAFAEL L. WALKER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, including Notice of Confiscated Property, Notice and Report of Action Taken on Correspondence, Requests for Interview, Statement on Offender's Religious Preference, records for grievance, administrative remedy,)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER v. GILSTRAP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL L. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GILSTRAP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKIE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK VANIHEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER HOLCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELBY CRICHFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS WELLINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?