INGALLS JR v. CENTURION HEALTH OF INDIANA, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN INGALLS JR
Defendant: CENTURION HEALTH OF INDIANA, LLC., ELIZABETH BENNETT, TRACY COBB, SHELBY CRICHFIELD and MIKE ELLIS
Case Number: 2:2023cv00221
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Mario Garcia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have through July 7, 2023, to pay the initial partial filing fee or explain why doing so is not possible. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 6/7/2023.(JRB)
May 12, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by STEVEN INGALLS JR. (AAS)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Six Dollars and Eighty-Nine Cents ($6.89). The plaintiff shall have through June 5, 2023, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. SEE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Matthew P Brookman on 5/5/23. (JRB)
May 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (MEH)
May 3, 2023 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB)
May 3, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DRB)
May 3, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff STEVEN INGALLS JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DRB)
May 3, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ELIZABETH BENNETT, CENTURION HEALTH OF INDIANA, LLC., TRACY COBB, SHELBY CRICHFIELD, MIKE ELLIS, filed by STEVEN INGALLS JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (DRB)
May 3, 2023 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by STEVEN INGALLS JR located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by STEVEN INGALLS JR to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (DRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INGALLS JR v. CENTURION HEALTH OF INDIANA, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN INGALLS JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION HEALTH OF INDIANA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY COBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELBY CRICHFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?