MARTIN v. BEDWELL et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MARTIN
Defendant: SARAH BEDWELL, BOBBI RIGGS, MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS, SARAH CLARKE, GALLION, AVERY HART, HAIL and FAGG
Case Number: 2:2023cv00511
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 25 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Court to Intervene, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (JSR)
December 27, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike Sarah Clarke's Affidavit, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (JSR)
December 27, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (JSR)
December 27, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY re #19 Response in Opposition to Motions #3 and #4 , filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (KAA)
December 18, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE to Inform the Court, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (JRB)
December 15, 2023 Filing 20 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by Anthony Martin. Copy/Copies provided via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Public Docket sheet) (LF)
December 13, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , and #5 MEMO in support of Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants SARAH BEDWELL, SARAH CLARKE, GALLION, BOBBI RIGGS, MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Sarah Clarke, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pltf's 2023 Mental Health Records (Redacted), #3 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion)(Andreas, Austin)
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SARAH BEDWELL, SARAH CLARKE, GALLION, BOBBI RIGGS, MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS.(Andreas, Austin)
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeb Adam Crandall on behalf of Defendants SARAH BEDWELL, SARAH CLARKE, GALLION, BOBBI RIGGS, MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS. (Crandall, Jeb)
November 30, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by GALLION, BOBBI RIGGS, SARAH BEDWELL, MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS, SARAH CLARKE. GALLION waiver sent on 11/29/2023; BOBBI RIGGS waiver sent on 11/29/2023; SARAH BEDWELL waiver sent on 11/29/2023; MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS waiver sent on 11/29/2023; SARAH CLARKE waiver sent on 11/29/2023. (Andreas, Austin)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ryan Andreas on behalf of Defendants SARAH BEDWELL, SARAH CLARKE, GALLION, BOBBI RIGGS, MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS. (Andreas, Austin)
November 29, 2023 Filing 14 Documents to be Sent via Electronic Notice - re #1 Complaint, #13 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk, #12 Order. Electronic Notice to Centurion. (JSR)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk upon: Sarah Bedwell; Bobbi Riggs; Mary Beth Ruth-Sims; Sarah Clarke; Ms. Gallion; Mrs. Avery Hart; Mr. Hail; Mrs. Fagg. (JSR)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - Because Mr. Martin is a "prisoner," this Court has an obligation to screen the complaint before service on the defendants. This action will proceed with First and Eighth Amendment claims for damages and injunctive relief, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, against Defendants Clarke, Bedwell, Riggs, Sims, Gallion, Avery, Hail, and Fagg. The clerk is directed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to the defendants in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process will consist of the complaint (dkt. #1 ), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this order. When the defendants answer the complaint, they need only address the allegations related to the claims proceeding in this action. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the process documents electronically on Centurion and to serve the defendants electronically. The defendants must respond to Mr. Martin's motions for preliminary injunction, dkts. #3 and #4 , no later than the date they answer the complaint. (See Order.) Signed by District Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/29/2023. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (JSR)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on In Forma Pauperis Status - #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. No initial partial filing fee is due at this time. The Court will screen the plaintiff's complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A in due course and in a separate entry. Signed by District Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/20/2023 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). (LBT)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail). (JRT)
October 31, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (KAA)
October 31, 2023 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
October 31, 2023 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The actionable claims asserted in Mr. Martin's complaint (See 2:23-cv-00282-JMS-MJD) arise from discrete events and can be resolved independently of one another. The Court exercises its discretion to sever the claims. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/31/2023.(KAA)
October 31, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KAA)
October 31, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (KAA) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/31/2023) (KAA).
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (KAA)
October 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KAA)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SARAH BEDWELL, SARAH CLARKE, FAGG, GALLION, HAIL, AVERY HART, BOBBI RIGGS, MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS, filed by ANTHONY MARTIN. (No fee paid with this filing) (KAA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. BEDWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH BEDWELL
Represented By: Austin Ryan Andreas
Represented By: Jeb Adam Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOBBI RIGGS
Represented By: Austin Ryan Andreas
Represented By: Jeb Adam Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY BETH RUTH-SIMS
Represented By: Austin Ryan Andreas
Represented By: Jeb Adam Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH CLARKE
Represented By: Austin Ryan Andreas
Represented By: Jeb Adam Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALLION
Represented By: Austin Ryan Andreas
Represented By: Jeb Adam Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVERY HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?