SCUTERI v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI
Defendant: CHRISTINA REAGLE, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TRICIA PRETORIUS, HEATHER RUSSELL, MAJOR DURREGAR and CARMEN BABB
Case Number: 2:2024cv00194
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: M Kendra Klump
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Case Consolidation, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA)
June 20, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI. (LF)
June 20, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI. (LF)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Thirty Dollars and Ten Cents ($30.10). The plaintiff shall have through July 12, 2024, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/13/2024. (BAA)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (JRT)
May 24, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
May 24, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 23, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI. (Attachments: #1 Offender Activity reports)(DJH)
May 23, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CARMEN BABB, MAJOR DURREGAR, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TRICIA PRETORIUS, CHRISTINA REAGLE, HEATHER RUSSELL, filed by MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH)
May 23, 2024 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI located at PUTNAMVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCUTERI v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA REAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRICIA PRETORIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR DURREGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN BABB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ANDREW SCUTERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?