MOORE v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: DUSTINE MOORE
Defendant: HEATHER RUSSELL, TRICIA PRETORIUS, DURREGAR, CARMEN BABB, CHRISTINA REAGLE and INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 2:2024cv00206
Filed: May 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mario Garcia
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES - Because there is no certified class action related to Plaintiff's pro se case, his motion to consolidate his case with No. 2:24-cv-00316-JPH-MKK to be part of a class action related to the allegations in his complaint, dkt. #10 , is DENIED without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/11/2024. (LBT)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Thirty Dollars and Fifty-Seven Cents ($30.57). The plaintiff shall have through August 8, 2024, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/8/2024. (LBT)
July 1, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Case Consolidation, filed by Plaintiff DUSTINE MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 Notice of Deficiency/Submission of Trust Account, filed by Plaintiff DUSTINE MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LBT)
June 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through July 3, 2024, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (JRT)
June 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (JRT)
May 29, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (CCG)
May 29, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CCG)
May 28, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DUSTINE MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)
May 28, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CARMEN BABB, DURREGAR, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TRICIA PRETORIUS, CHRISTINA REAGLE, HEATHER RUSSELL, filed by DUSTINE MOORE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)
May 28, 2024 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by DUSTINE MOORE located at PUTNAMVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by DUSTINE MOORE to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRICIA PRETORIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURREGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN BABB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA REAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTINE MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?