HACKER v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: GARRETT HACKER
Defendant: CARMEN BABB, TRICIA PRETORIUS, CHRISTINA REAGLE, HEATHER RUSSELL, MAJOR DURREGAR and INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 2:2024cv00212
Filed: May 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: M Kendra Klump
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time and Directing Plaintiff's Custodian to Forward Certified Copy of Inmate Trust Account Statement: Mr. Hacker's motion for extension of time, dkt. #8 , is granted to the extent that the Court hereby ORDERS Warden Tricia Pretorius or her designee at the Putnamville Correctional Facility to provide the Court with a certified copy of Mr. Hacker's trust account statement or the Putnamville Correctional Facility's institutional equivalent for the six-month period preceding the filing of this action on May 28, 2024, and to do so no later than August 12, 2024. The trust account statement should be submitted to the Clerk of the Court and should reference case number No. 2:24-cv-00212-JPH-MKK. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 7/19/2024.(Copy mailed per Distribution list.) (LF)
July 15, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE to notice Dkt. #7 submission of Trust Account, filed by Plaintiff GARRETT HACKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2024: #2 Exhibit Attachment) (CKM).
July 1, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Case Consolidation, filed by Plaintiff GARRETT HACKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA)
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Inmate Trust Account, filed by Plaintiff GARRETT HACKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AJG)
June 11, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through July 9, 2024, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (MEH)
June 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (JRT)
May 30, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 28, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff GARRETT HACKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)
May 28, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CARMEN BABB, MAJOR DURREGAR, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TRICIA PRETORIUS, CHRISTINA REAGLE, HEATHER RUSSELL, filed by GARRETT HACKER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)
May 28, 2024 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by GARRETT HACKER located at PUTNAMVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by GARRETT HACKER to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HACKER v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN BABB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRICIA PRETORIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA REAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR DURREGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRETT HACKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?