MULLIS v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: BRENT MULLIS
Defendant: DURREGAR, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, HEATHER RUSSELL, TRICIA PRETORIUS, CARMEN BABB and CHRISTINA REAGLE
Case Number: 2:2024cv00223
Filed: May 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: M Kendra Klump
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES - Because there is no certified class action related to Plaintiff's pro se case, his motion to consolidate his case with No. 2:24-cv-00316-JPH-MKK to be part of a class action related to the allegations in his complaint, dkt. #11 , is DENIED without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/23/2024. (LBT)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Ordering Plaintiff to File Trust Account Statement - The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. [ #3 ], is denied as presented. The plaintiff will have 21 days from the date of this order to renew his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by filing a copy of his relevant trust account statement. Failure to act by this deadline will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning or opportunity to show cause. See Order for additional information. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/23/2024. (SWM)
July 1, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Case Consolidation, filed by Plaintiff BRENT MULLIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KAA)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER terminating #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is clear that Mr. Mullis intended to file this motion in Mullis v. Pretorious, case number 2:24-cv-00315-JPH-MJD, which was filed on June 14, 2024, along with a motion for emergency stay. Thus, the clerk is directed to terminate the motion at dkt. #9 , and redocket it in case number 2:24-cv-00315-JPH-MJD. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/24/24. (RSF)
June 20, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff BRENT MULLIS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LBT)
June 7, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge, filed by BRENT MULLIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(SWM)
June 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through July 3, 2024, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (JRT)
June 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (JRT)
May 30, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (CCG)
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (CCG)
May 28, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff BRENT MULLIS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)
May 28, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CARMEN BABB, DURREGAR, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, TRICIA PRETORIUS, CHRISTINA REAGLE, HEATHER RUSSELL, filed by BRENT MULLIS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)
May 28, 2024 Filing 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by BRENT MULLIS located at PUTNAMVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by BRENT MULLIS to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLIS v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURREGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRICIA PRETORIUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN BABB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA REAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT MULLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?