MARTIN v. WABASH VAL, COR, FAC MEDICAL STAFF et al
Plaintiff: KAMERON W. MARTIN
Defendant: SAMUEL J. BYRD, BARBARA *BOBBI* RIGGS, DESIRAE, KAYCEE BURRIS, WABASH VAL, COR, FAC MEDICAL STAFF, LEE SHORTER and EMILY ENRIQUEZ
Case Number: 2:2024cv00283
Filed: June 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Kameron Martin's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that he is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $47.87. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Mr. Martin will have through July 26, 2024, to pay this sum to the clerk of the District Court. SEE ORDER. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 06/20/2024. (AAS)
June 20, 2024 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by KAMERON W. MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
June 11, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail). (JRT)
June 6, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (DJH)
June 6, 2024 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
June 5, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff KAMERON W. MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Certified Counselors Statement Of Inmate Trust Fund Account, Affidavit Of Special Circumstances #2 Envelope)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. WABASH VAL, COR, FAC MEDICAL STAFF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL J. BYRD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA *BOBBI* RIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESIRAE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAYCEE BURRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABASH VAL, COR, FAC MEDICAL STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE SHORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY ENRIQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMERON W. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?