GENERAL WASTE PRODUCTS, INC. v. CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GENERAL WASTE PRODUCTS, INC.
Defendant: EVANSVILLE MARINE SERVICES, INC., LYNN SENZELL, TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE CO., MARSHA TROCKMAN, VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY, TRANSCONTINENTAL INSURANCE CO., RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT, INC., ANNIE GREENBLUM, DAVID G. MOUNTS, CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, SUSAN SUSSMAN, ESTATE OF ALLAN I. TROCKMAN and EVANSVILLE GREENWAY AND REMEDIATION TRUST
Intervenor Plaintiff: Kenneth M. Newcomb, Sr.
Interested Party: CNA
Case Number: 3:2001cv00096
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Evansville Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Presiding Judge: William G. Hussmann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - The court, by Docket No. 43 , previously granted 12 Motion to Intervene and 13 Motion to Enforce Payment of Real Estate Commission. Remaining are 17 Motion in Support of Termination of the Trust and Motion for Deposit of Trust Proce eds with the Venderburgh Clerk of Court and the Estate's 34 Supplemental Brief. For reasons explained in this Order, the Magistrate Judge declines to undertake the resolution of the remaining claims between the Estate participants and Mr. Mounts as to any remaining amounts in dispute between those parties and leaves those to resolution by agreement of the parties or decision by an appropriate Indiana state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 2/4/2013. (NRN)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on Distribution on the "Trockman Share" - Pursuant to the terms of the Trust Agreement itself and the Forbearance Agreement to which the Trust is a party, the Trustee shall disburse the net proceeds of the sale of the River Yard to David G. Mounts. (copies mailed to non-represented parties) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr., on 1/28/2013.(NRN) Modified on 1/28/2013 (SMD).
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr: Hearing on Trustee's 2 Motion to convey the "River Yard Site" held on 12/12/2012. The court grants in part 2 Motion, and the Trustee is ordered to provide an appropriate deed and necessary closing documents to effectuate the sale of the River Yard Site. Mounts is ordered to execute documents required by the title company to reflect a release of any and all liens as they apply to the River Yard Site only. The Trustee is ORDERED to maintain the funds received from the sale of the River Yard Site until further order of this court, except that from the funds at closing may be paid appropriate real estate taxes and title insurance fees. The Tr ustee is ORDERED to prepare on or before January 3, 2013, a proposed final distribution order for the court's review. On or before January 9, 2013, Mounts, the Estate of Allan Trockman, Marsha Trockman, Mr. Newcomb, and any other interested part ies shall file and serve any objections to the Trustee's proposed distribution. Motion Hearing on any objections to the Trustee's proposed distribution previously set for 12/18/2012 is RESCHEDULED for 1/9/2013 01:00 PM in room #335, United States Courthouse, 101 Northwest MLK Boulevard, Evansville, Indiana before Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr. See entry for other orders entered.(NRN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL WASTE PRODUCTS, INC. v. CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kenneth M. Newcomb, Sr.
Represented By: Edward W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSVILLE MARINE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Salvatore Lavallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN SENZELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSPORTATION INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Tammy Jo Meyer
Represented By: Gary Lee Miller
Represented By: Rebecca L. Ross
Represented By: Scott E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHA TROCKMAN
Represented By: Katharine Vanost Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Tammy Jo Meyer
Represented By: Gary Lee Miller
Represented By: Rebecca L. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSCONTINENTAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Scott E. Turner
Represented By: Rebecca L. Ross
Represented By: Gary Lee Miller
Represented By: Tammy Jo Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESOLUTE MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: William Stacey White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNIE GREENBLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID G. MOUNTS
Represented By: Gregory Alan Kahre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Scott E. Turner
Represented By: Gary Lee Miller
Represented By: Rebecca L. Ross
Represented By: Tammy Jo Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN SUSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF ALLAN I. TROCKMAN
Represented By: Donald R. Vowels
Represented By: Laurie Baiden Bumb
Represented By: E. Lee Veazey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSVILLE GREENWAY AND REMEDIATION TRUST
Represented By: Kathleen G. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL WASTE PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Orville Nelson
Represented By: Philip C. Hunsucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CNA
Represented By: Scott E. Turner
Represented By: Kathleen Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?