JOHNSON v. COURIER & PRESS NEW'S et al

Plaintiff: GERALD E. JOHNSON and GERALD EDWARD JOHNSON
Defendant: COURIER & PRESS NEW'S and DAVE WEDDING
Case Number: 3:2018cv00144
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Evansville Office
0 Judge: Matthew P Brookman
1 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 10 Updated address for GERALD E. JOHNSON from Branchville Correctional Facility to PLAINFIELD CORRECTIONAL FACILITY. Resent dkts 7 and 8 to JOHNSON at new address. (MEH)
October 4, 2018 9 Mail Returned as NO LONGER AT FACILITY. #8 Closed Judgment, #7 Order sent to GERALD EDWARD JOHNSON BRANCHVILLE CF. (JRB)
October 3, 2018 8 FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. This action was dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/3/2018.(JRB)
October 3, 2018 7 Featured Case Order Dismissing Action and Directing Entry of Final Judgment - E-Service program. For the reasons explained in the screening entry of August 20, 2018, see dkt. 6, this action is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Final judgment consistent with this Order shall now enter. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/3/2018.(JRB)
August 20, 2018 6 Featured Case Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Status, Directing Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee, Screening and Dismissing Complaint, and Allowing Plaintiff to Show Cause - Plaintiff Gerald Edward Johnson is an Indiana prison inmate incarcerated in the Branchville Correctional Facility. Proceeding pro se, he brought this 42 U.S.C. 1983 action for an incident occurring while he was a jail inmate in Vanderburgh County, Indiana. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(B), an initial partial filing fee of four dollars and seventy-four cents ($4.74) is assessed and shall be paid to the clerk of the district court no later than September 28, 2018. Mr. Johnson to show cause why the action should not be dismissed and he should be allowed to proceed with his claims. Mr. Johnson shall have through September 28, 2018, in which to show the Court why this action should proceed. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/20/2018. (JRB)
August 16, 2018 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 15, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, GERALD E. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency)(DJH)
August 15, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, GERALD E. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency and Notice)(DJH)
August 15, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against COURIER & PRESS NEW'S, DAVE WEDDING, filed by GERALD E. JOHNSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (DJH)
August 15, 2018 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by GERALD E. JOHNSON located at BRANCHVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by GERALD E. JOHNSON to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. COURIER & PRESS NEW'S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURIER & PRESS NEW'S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE WEDDING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD E. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD EDWARD JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?