HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS v. HENNINGS et al
Plaintiff: HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS
Defendant: COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRANSPORTATION LENDING SERVICES, AGRONOMY SERVICES and LARRY HENNINGS
Case Number: 3:2018cv00243
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: - The court VACATES the INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE currently set for March 11, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE is set for APRIL 8, 2019 at 1:00 p.m., Evansville time (CST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge, in Room 328 of the Winfield K. Denton Federal Building/U.S. Courthouse, Evansville, Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/7/2019.(JRB)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/23/2019.(JRB)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Miles on behalf of Plaintiff HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS. (Miles, Robert)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Removal Notice in the Daviess County Circuit Court by AGRONOMY SERVICES, LARRY HENNINGS (Sullivan, Chad)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AGRONOMY SERVICES. (Sullivan, Chad)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad J. Sullivan on behalf of Defendants AGRONOMY SERVICES, LARRY HENNINGS. (Sullivan, Chad)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Daviess County Circuit Court, case number 14C01-1811-PL-0595, filed by LARRY HENNINGS, AGRONOMY SERVICES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5196418) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Record, #2 Exhibit B - Consent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS v. HENNINGS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRANSPORTATION LENDING SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGRONOMY SERVICES
Represented By: Chad J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY HENNINGS
Represented By: Chad J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAWTHORNE FAMILY FARMS
Represented By: Brandon Gregory Smith
Represented By: Robert T. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?