HEDGE v. TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. et al

Plaintiff: DENIA HEDGE, DUSTIN TURLEY and MELISSA MCCLARY
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. and AEROTEK, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00246
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Tenth) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 - Consent of William Reed Hamm) (Hunt, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action and FLSA Collective Action Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by DENIA HEDGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Orientation Guide)(Hunt, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Ninth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Consent of Linda Moore) (Hunt, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Eighth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Consent of Mike Gallamore) (Hunt, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Forms (Seventh) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Consent of David Conner, #2 Exhibit 10 - Consent of Shalynn Miller) (Hunt, Robert)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 09:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/23/2019.(JRB)
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. identifying Other Affiliate TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, Other Affiliate TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., Other Affiliate TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC. for TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC... (Hutton, Zachary)
January 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant AEROTEK, INC.. (Borkowski, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AEROTEK, INC.. (Borkowski, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Borkowski on behalf of Defendant AEROTEK, INC.. (Borkowski, John)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Anna M. Skaggs for TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/16/2019. (JRB)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Zachary P. Hutton for TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/16/2019. (JRB)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Zina Deldar for TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/16/2019. (JRB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna M. Skaggs to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number EV006539), filed by Defendant TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JRB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Zachary P. Hutton to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number EV006539), filed by Defendant TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JRB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 RECEIPT #EV006539 for Pro Hac Vice Fee fee in the amount of $100.00, paid by Christina VanMeter. (JRB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Zina Deldar to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendant TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JRB)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DENIA HEDGE. TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. served on 1/2/2019. (Hunt, Robert)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DENIA HEDGE. AEROTEK, INC. served on 12/31/2018. (Hunt, Robert)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Form (Sixth), filed by Plaintiff DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 - Consent of Melissa McClary) (Hunt, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Fifth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Consent of Lindsay Granderson) (Hunt, Robert)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Form (Fourth) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Consent of James Carlton) (Hunt, Robert)
December 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (Third) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Consent of Seth Hawkins) (Hunt, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Forms (Second) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Consent of Johnny Johann, #2 Exhibit 3 -Consent of Dustin Turley, #3 Exhibit 4 - Consent of Daryl McCullough) (Hunt, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaint Form (First) by DENIA HEDGE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent of Denia Hedge) (Hunt, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AEROTEK, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. (JRB)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Hunt on behalf of Plaintiff DENIA HEDGE. (Hunt, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DENIA HEDGE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5205092) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Orientation Guide, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEDGE v. TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENIA HEDGE
Represented By: Robert J. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN TURLEY
Represented By: Robert J. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA MCCLARY
Represented By: Robert J. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INDIANA, INC.
Represented By: Anna M. Skaggs
Represented By: Zina Deldar
Represented By: Zachary P. Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROTEK, INC.
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?