SECURA INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY v. WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC. et al

Plaintiff: SECURA INSURANCE
Defendant: JOHN COLEMAN and WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00039
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/22/2019. (TMD)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC.. (Havill, Clay)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC.. (LAB) (JRB)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Clay W. Havill on behalf of Defendant WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC.. (Havill, Clay)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, filed by JOHN COLEMAN.(Armstrong, Sacha)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SECURA INSURANCE. WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC. waiver sent on 2/26/2019. (Wooton, Lewis)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SECURA INSURANCE. JOHN COLEMAN waiver sent on 2/26/2019. (Wooton, Lewis)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Sacha L. Armstrong hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Armstrong, Sacha)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sacha L. Armstrong on behalf of Defendant JOHN COLEMAN. (Armstrong, Sacha)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard O. Hawley, Jr on behalf of Defendant JOHN COLEMAN. (Hawley, Richard)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECURA INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY. (Wooton, Lewis)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis S. Wooton on behalf of Plaintiff SECURA INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY. (Wooton, Lewis)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN COLEMAN, WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC., filed by SECURA INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5300565) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wooton, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURA INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY v. WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURA INSURANCE
Represented By: Lewis S. Wooton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN COLEMAN
Represented By: Richard O. Hawley, Jr.
Represented By: Sacha L. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS BROS. HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: Clay W. Havill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?