FRUIT v. BERRY GLOBAL, INC.

Plaintiff: GREGORY FRUIT
Defendant: BERRY GLOBAL, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00102
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to 8/22/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/27/2019. (JRB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Second Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BERRY GLOBAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roelle, Carrie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by GREGORY FRUIT. BERRY GLOBAL, INC. served on 5/20/2019. (Biesecker, Kyle)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 11:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/24/2019.(JRB)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BERRY GLOBAL, INC.. (Roelle, Carrie)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BERRY GLOBAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent BERRY GLOBAL GROUP, INC. for BERRY GLOBAL, INC... (Roelle, Carrie)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Mount Roelle on behalf of Defendant BERRY GLOBAL, INC.. (Roelle, Carrie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BERRY GLOBAL, INC. (JRB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Plaintiff GREGORY FRUIT. (Biesecker, Kyle)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against BERRY GLOBAL, INC., filed by GREGORY FRUIT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5433206) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Biesecker, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRUIT v. BERRY GLOBAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERRY GLOBAL, INC.
Represented By: Carrie Mount Roelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY FRUIT
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?