STOCK et al v. MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT STOCK and RETHA STOCK
Defendant: MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC and PHILLIP WINDERS
Case Number: 3:2019cv00115
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs RETHA STOCK, ROBERT STOCK . (Barber, Steve)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lee Tyler on behalf of Defendants MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC, PHILLIP WINDERS. (Tyler, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC. (Eberwine, Eric)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Eberwine, Eric)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Thomas Eberwine on behalf of Defendants MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC, PHILLIP WINDERS. (Eberwine, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by All Plaintiffs. PHILLIP WINDERS served on 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Green Card)(Barber, Steve)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC and PHILLIP WINDERS. (JRB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Barber on behalf of Plaintiffs Retha Stock, Robert Stock. (Barber, Steve)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5454326) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Michael Long Farms, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Phillip Winders)(Barber, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOCK et al v. MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LONG FARMS LLC
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP WINDERS
Represented By: Eric Thomas Eberwine
Represented By: Scott Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STOCK
Represented By: Steve Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RETHA STOCK
Represented By: Steve Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?