BREWER v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.
Plaintiff: BRADEN K. BREWER
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00165
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/05/2019 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO..(Cox, Dina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Neal Bowling on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.. (Bowling, Joseph)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.. (Cox, Dina)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Giordano on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.. (Giordano, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.. (Cox, Dina)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina M. Cox on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.. (Cox, Dina)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Gibson County, case number 26D01-1907-CT000999, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5577301) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 State Court Record B: State Court Record (Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Appearance, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Certified Mail Returned, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Dina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREWER v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADEN K. BREWER
Represented By: Derek Robert Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: Dina M. Cox
Represented By: Michael Robert Giordano
Represented By: Joseph Neal Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?