FISHER v. EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION
Plaintiff: BRIGGETTA FISHER
Defendant: EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION
Case Number: 3:2019cv00170
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/8/2019.(JRB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION identifying Corporate Parent Evansville Rescue Mission, Inc for EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION.. (Antaki, Vincent)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION.(Antaki, Vincent)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Antaki on behalf of Defendant EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION. (Antaki, Vincent)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by BRIGGETTA FISHER. EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION served on 9/3/2019. (Biesecker, Kyle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION. (JRB)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Plaintiff BRIGGETTA FISHER. (Biesecker, Kyle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION d/b/a YOUTH CARE CENTER, filed by BRIGGETTA FISHER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5582047) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Biesecker, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FISHER v. EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSVILLE RESCUE MISSION
Represented By: Vincent P. Antaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGGETTA FISHER
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?