BRUCE v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Mr CHRISTOPHER L BRUCE and CHRISTOPHER L. BRUCE
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC., YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF LOUISVILLE, LLC, Mr ANTHONY K SHIELDS and ANTHONY K. SHIELDS
Case Number: 3:2020cv00040
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against ANTHONY K. SHIELDS, YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF LOUISVILLE, LLC, filed by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Kreighbaum, John)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, filed by PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC..(Kreighbaum, John)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny E. Glass on behalf of Defendants NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Glass, Danny)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION for NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.. (Kreighbaum, John)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Kreighbaum, John)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Kreighbaum, John)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Kreighbaum on behalf of Defendants NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Kreighbaum, John)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Thomas Ledrick at the residence of Anthony K. Shields on 02/24/2020, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. BRUCE. (Brennan, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Jeffrey L. Mackin, Registered Agent for Yellow Cab of Louisville LLC on 02/24/2020, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. BRUCE. (Brennan, Ryan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. BRUCE. PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC. served on 2/21/2020. (Brennan, Ryan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by CHRISTOPHER L. BRUCE. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 2/21/2020. (Brennan, Ryan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC., ANTHONY K. SHIELDS, YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF LOUISVILLE, LLC. (JRB)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan E. Brennan on behalf of Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER L BRUCE. (Brennan, Ryan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CHRISTOPHER L BRUCE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5867182) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Brennan, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRUCE v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Danny E. Glass
Represented By: John J. Kreighbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROFESSIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Danny E. Glass
Represented By: John J. Kreighbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YELLOW CAB COMPANY OF LOUISVILLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr ANTHONY K SHIELDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY K. SHIELDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr CHRISTOPHER L BRUCE
Represented By: Ryan E. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. BRUCE
Represented By: Ryan E. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?