BASS v. STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC
Plaintiff: ZACHARY BASS
Defendant: STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00077
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC.(Ahlers, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on June 24, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/15/2020.(AAS)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Ahlers on behalf of Defendant STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warrick Circuit Court, case number 87C01-2002-CC-000264, filed by STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5935675) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Exhibit A - Appearance for Plaintiff, Complaint, Affidavit of Plaintiff, Summons, Order to Show Cause, Appearance for Defendant, Defendant's Notice of Extension of Time, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint in Replevin, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Plaintiff, Zachary Bass, #4 Exhibit D - Order to Show Cause, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ahlers, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASS v. STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRATEGIC ALLIANCE MANAGEMENT JV, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Ahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY BASS
Represented By: Mark Kelly Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?