HURLEY v. PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC.
Plaintiff: CHANCE HURLEY
Defendant: PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00094
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on July 13, 2020 at 9:30 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/29/2020.(AAS)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative and Other Defenses, filed by PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC..(Papageorge, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan Carl Fretwell on behalf of Defendant PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC.. (Fretwell, Tristan)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC. (Papageorge, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Securitas A.B. Co. for PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC... (Papageorge, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Papageorge on behalf of Defendant PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC.. (Papageorge, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Warrick County Civil Circuit Court, case number 87C01-2003-CT-000356, filed by PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5964101) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Summons, Complaint, Appearance-Plaintiff, Appearance-Defendant, Notice of Extension), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Papageorge, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HURLEY v. PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINKERTON CONSULTING & INVESTIGATIONS, INC.
Represented By: John D. Papageorge
Represented By: Tristan Carl Fretwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANCE HURLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?