SCHNAPF v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA SCHNAPF
Defendant: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00151
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Weller, Jennifer)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Wigington Weller on behalf of Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Weller, Jennifer)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Schultz, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by CYNTHIA SCHNAPF. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. served on 7/24/2020. (Vlahakis, James)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.. (JRB)
July 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Constantine Vlahakis on behalf of Plaintiff CYNTHIA SCHNAPF. (Vlahakis, James)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., filed by CYNTHIA SCHNAPF. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6061019) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Vlahakis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHNAPF v. MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA SCHNAPF
Represented By: James Constantine Vlahakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer Wigington Weller
Represented By: David M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?