RINELLA v. ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.
Plaintiff: BARRI RINELLA
Defendant: ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00189
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel - Defendant's Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents propounded upon Plaintiff, Barri Rinella by Michael S. Maloney on behalf of ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC. (Maloney, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert T. Garwood on behalf of Plaintiff BARRI RINELLA. (Garwood, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Robert T. Garwood hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Garwood, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on NOVEMBER 10, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/3/2020.(AAS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dubois, case number 19C01-2006-CT-000279, filed by ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6132692) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Secretary of State Information re Ross Dress for Less, Inc., #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit - Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit - Appearance of Counsel - Michael S. Maloney for Defendant, #7 Exhibit - Appearance of Counsel - Deanna M. Tucker for Defendant, #8 Exhibit - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Ross Dress for Less, Inc.)(Maloney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RINELLA v. ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Deanna Marie Marzian Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRI RINELLA
Represented By: Robert T. Garwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?