JACKSON v. WARDEN
Petitioner: BRUCE JACKSON
Respondent: WARDEN
Case Number: 3:2020cv00190
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a return to the order to show cause - Respondent shall file a return to the order to show cause and the complete administrative record by November 18, 2020. Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/13/2020. (AAS)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to November 18, 2020 in which to #3 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary) , filed by Respondent WARDEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornelius, Katherine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Cornelius on behalf of Respondent WARDEN. (Cornelius, Katherine)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary), filed by Petitioner BRUCE JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Submission of Information re: Case, filed by Petitioner BRUCE JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB) Modified on 9/3/2020 (JRB). Modified on 9/3/2020 (JRB).
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by BRUCE JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIPT #IP070494 for filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by BRUCE JACKSON. (DJH)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2020. Bruce Jackson's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary convictionin disciplinary case number BCF 20-06-0304. Petitioner shall have through September 28, 2020, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/26/2020.(JRB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by BRUCE JACKSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Represented By: Katherine A. Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRUCE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?